GA HB744 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 2 of Article 7 of Chapter 6 of Title 44 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to partition, so as to enact the "Uniform Partition of Heirs Property Act"; to provide for construction with federal law; to amend Code Section 24-7-706 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to court appointed experts, so as to include cross-references; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Uniform Partition of Heirs Property Act; enact
Sponsors
Rep. Stacey Abrams [D] | Rep. Stephen Allison [R] | Rep. Kathy Ashe [D] | Sen. Bill Hamrick [R] |
Rep. Edward Lindsey [R] | Rep. Billy Maddox [R] | Rep. Jay Neal [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #759 - Passage (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - House Vote #488 - Passage (Y: 166 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - House Vote #488 - Passage (Y: 166 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-01 | Effective Date | |
2012-04-16 | Act 585 | |
2012-04-16 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-03 | House Sent to Governor | |
2012-03-27 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-27 | Senate Third Read | |
2012-03-21 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2012-03-20 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-17 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2012-02-16 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-02-16 | House Third Readers | |
2012-02-09 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-01-24 | House Second Readers | |
2012-01-23 | House First Readers |