GA HB740 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Effective Date 2021-05-03
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Effective Date 2021-05-03
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act incorporating the Town of Pendergrass, in the County of Jackson, approved December 30, 1890 (Ga. L. 1890-91, Vol. II, p. 681), as amended, particularly by an Act approved April 5, 1994 (Ga. L. 1994, p. 4755), so as to add two new members to the city council; to revise provisions governing quorums and overriding vetoes; to update reference to applicable state election law; to provide for initial and staggered terms of the new councilmembers; to provide for conflict of interest; to provide for holding of other offices; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Pendergrass, City of; add two new members to city council
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #297 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - Local Calendar: House Vote #263 (Y: 137 N: 11 NV: 18 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - Local Calendar: House Vote #263 (Y: 137 N: 11 NV: 18 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | Effective Date 2021-05-03 | |
2021-05-03 | Act 80 | |
2021-05-03 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2021-04-06 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-03-18 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2021-03-18 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-03-18 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-03-10 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-03-09 | House | House First Readers |
2021-03-08 | House | House Hopper |