GA HB740 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Subpart 1A of Part 2 of Article 16 of Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to improved student learning environment and discipline in elementary and secondary education, so as to require local school systems to conduct certain screenings, assessments, and reviews prior to expelling or assigning a student in kindergarten through third grade to out-of-school suspension for five or more consecutive or cumulative days during a school year; to provide exceptions; to provide for a definition; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education; local school system to conduct certain screenings, assessments, and reviews prior to expelling a student; require

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-29 - House - House Vote #814 (Y: 167 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Vote #648 (Y: 46 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House Vote #503 (Y: 157 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-01 Effective Date
2018-05-08 Act 450
2018-05-08HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2018-04-04HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2018-03-29HouseHouse Agreed Senate Amend or Sub
2018-03-21SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-03-21SenateSenate Third Read
2018-03-15SenateSenate Read Second Time
2018-03-14SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-02-15SenateSenate Read and Referred
2018-02-14HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-02-14HouseHouse Third Readers
2018-02-08HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-01-29HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-01-25HouseHouse First Readers
2018-01-24HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback