GA HB736 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Effective Date 2023-05-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Effective Date 2023-05-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to create a board of elections and registration for Ben Hill County, approved April 13, 1994 (Ga. L. 1994, p. 4989), so as to revise provisions relating to the appointment of board members; to revise provisions relating to filling vacancies on the board; to revise provisions as to the compensation of board members; to redesignate the chief executive officer of the board; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Ben Hill County; board of elections and registration; appointment of board members; revise provisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-27 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #296 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - Hbs 710, 713, 730, 736: House Vote #252 (Y: 101 N: 72 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - Hbs 710, 713, 730, 736: House Vote #252 (Y: 101 N: 72 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | Effective Date 2023-05-01 | |
2023-05-01 | Act 205 | |
2023-05-01 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2023-03-31 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2023-03-20 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2023-03-20 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2023-03-16 | House | House Second Readers |
2023-03-15 | House | House First Readers |
2023-03-14 | House | House Hopper |