GA HB732 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 40-2-84 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the issuance of license plates to veterans awarded Purple Hearts, so as to include persons still serving in the armed services; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Special license plates; Purple Hearts; include persons serving in armed services
Sponsors
Sen. John Bulloch [R] | Rep. Doug Collins [R] | Rep. Bob Hanner [D] | Rep. Tony McBrayer [R] |
Rep. Tom Rice [R] | Sen. Ed Setzler [R] | Rep. John Yates [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-29 - House - House Vote #830 - Agree Sen Am (Y: 167 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #693 - Passage As Amended (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House Vote #599 - Passage (Y: 166 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #693 - Passage As Amended (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House Vote #599 - Passage (Y: 166 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2012-04-16 | Act 594 | |
2012-04-16 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-10 | House Sent to Governor | |
2012-03-29 | House Agree Senate Amend or Sub | |
2012-03-26 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-26 | Senate Third Read | |
2012-03-14 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2012-03-13 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-03-07 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2012-03-05 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-05 | House Third Readers | |
2012-02-24 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-01-23 | House Second Readers | |
2012-01-13 | House First Readers |