GA HB730 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-08 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-08 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 8 of Title 35 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to employment and training of peace officers, so as to add the commissioner of juvenile justice or his or her designee as a voting member of the Georgia Peace Officer Standards and Training Council; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Peace Officer Standards and Training Council; commissioner of juvenile justice as a voting member; add
Sponsors
Rep. Alan Powell [R] | Rep. Tom Weldon [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-04 - House - House Vote #494 (Y: 167 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-08 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-02-04 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2016-02-04 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-02-01 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2016-01-13 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-01-12 | House | House First Readers |
2016-01-11 | House | House Hopper |