GA HB728 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-08 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-08 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act relating to education and to revenue and taxation authorizing the Public Education Innovation Fund Foundation to receive private donations to be used for grants to public schools and providing for an income tax credit for qualified education donations, approved April 27, 2017 (Ga. L. 2017, p. 100), so as to repeal an uncodified sunset provision; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Public Education Innovation Fund Foundation; repeal an uncodified sunset provision
Sponsors
Rep. Brooks Coleman [R] | Rep. Robert Dickey [R] | Rep. Earl Ehrhart [R] | Rep. Jon Burns [R] |
Rep. Randy Nix [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-07 - House - House Vote #469 (Y: 153 N: 1 NV: 15 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-08 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-02-07 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2018-02-07 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-02-01 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-01-25 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-01-24 | House | House First Readers |
2018-01-23 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/52144 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20172018/171389 |
Roll Call | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/52144#15599 |