GA HB728 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-11 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-11 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to create and establish the Greene County Airport Authority, approved March 13, 1978 (Ga. L. 1978, p. 3223), so as to change the reimbursement of members of the authority; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Greene County Airport Authority; reimbursement of members; change
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #272 - Local Consent Calendar (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2009-03-18 - House - House Vote #292 - Local Calendar (Y: 147 N: 1 NV: 20 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2009-03-18 - House - House Vote #292 - Local Calendar (Y: 147 N: 1 NV: 20 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Effective Date | |
2009-05-11 | Act 294 | |
2009-05-11 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-15 | House Sent to Governor | |
2009-03-26 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2009-03-26 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-03-19 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2009-03-18 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2009-03-18 | House Third Readers | |
2009-03-18 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-03-17 | House Second Readers | |
2009-03-12 | House First Readers |