GA HB721 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-29 - House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub As Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-29 - House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub As Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 40-5-27 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to examination of applicants, so as to revise the criteria by which the Department of Driver Services shall authorize licensed driver training schools to administer the on-the-road driving skills testing; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Motor vehicles; criteria by which the Department of Driver Services shall authorize licensed driver training schools to administer on-the-road driving skills testing; revise
Sponsors
Rep. Alan Powell [R] | Rep. James Epps [R] | Sen. John Albers [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - House - House Vote #855 (Y: 126 N: 38 NV: 13 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-23 - Senate - Senate Vote #684 (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House Vote #574 (Y: 105 N: 57 NV: 9 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-23 - Senate - Senate Vote #684 (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House Vote #574 (Y: 105 N: 57 NV: 9 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-29 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub As Amended |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-02-26 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-02-26 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-02-22 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2018-02-12 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-01-24 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-01-23 | House | House First Readers |
2018-01-22 | House | House Hopper |