GA HB72 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-25 - House Third Reading Lost
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-25 - House Third Reading Lost
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating the Board of Commissioners of Clayton County, approved February 8, 1955 (Ga. L. 1955, p. 2064), as amended, particularly by an Act approved April 13, 2001 (Ga. L. 2001, p. 4321), so as to provide the salaries of the chairperson and members of the Clayton County Board of Commissioners; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Clayton County; Board of Commissioners; provide salaries of chairperson and members
Sponsors
Rep. Rhonda Burnough [D] | Rep. Sandra Scott [D] | Rep. Kim Schofield [D] | Rep. Demetrius Douglas [D] |
Rep. Mike Glanton [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-25 - House - House Vote #63 (Y: 82 N: 72 NV: 18 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-25 | House | House Third Reading Lost |
2019-02-25 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-02-22 | House | House Postponed |
2019-02-22 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-02-06 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2019-02-06 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-01-30 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-01-29 | House | House First Readers |
2019-01-28 | House | House Hopper |