GA HB714 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-24 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-24 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 7 of Chapter 8 of Title 34 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to benefits relative to employment security, so as to provide changes to the determination of eligibility for unemployment benefits of certain persons performing certain services; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Labor; determination of eligibility for unemployment benefits of certain people performing certain services; provide changes
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Hamilton [R] | Rep. John Meadows [R] | Rep. Matthew Ramsey [R] | Rep. Allen Peake [R] |
Rep. Jay Powell [R] | Rep. Jan Jones [R] | Sen. Francis Millar [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #738 (Y: 36 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - House - House Vote #869 (Y: 107 N: 64 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - Senate - Senate Vote #654 (Y: 34 N: 17 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - House - House Vote #498 (Y: 111 N: 60 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - House - House Vote #869 (Y: 107 N: 64 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - Senate - Senate Vote #654 (Y: 34 N: 17 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - House - House Vote #498 (Y: 111 N: 60 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-24 | Effective Date | |
2014-04-24 | Act 625 | |
2014-04-24 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2014-03-27 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2014-03-20 | House | House Agrees Senate Amend or Sub |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2014-02-10 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2014-02-10 | House | House Third Readers |
2014-02-06 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2014-01-15 | House | House Second Readers |
2014-01-14 | House | House First Readers |
2014-01-13 | House | House Hopper |