GA HB711 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 5 of the Title 24 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to privileges, so as to change provisions relating to spousal privilege in criminal proceedings; to provide certain exceptions to the general rule of privilege; to provide for confidentiality of communications between a family violence or sexual assault victim and agents providing services to such victims at family violence shelters and rape crisis centers; to provide for definitions; to provide for a waiver of confidentiality; to provide for admissibility of certain information; to provide for exceptions; to provide for procedure; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Evidence; privileges; change provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Alex Atwood [R] | Rep. Stephanie Benfield [D] | Sen. Bill Hamrick [R] | Rep. Penny Houston [R] |
Rep. Mike Jacobs [R] | Rep. Edward Lindsey [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-21 - Senate - Senate Vote #663 - Passage (Y: 52 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - Senate - Senate Vote #662 - Adoption Of Amendment #1 By The Senator From The 32nd (Y: 13 N: 39 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2012-02-07 - House - House Vote #470 - Passage (Y: 162 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - Senate - Senate Vote #662 - Adoption Of Amendment #1 By The Senator From The 32nd (Y: 13 N: 39 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2012-02-07 - House - House Vote #470 - Passage (Y: 162 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-01 | Effective Date | |
2012-04-16 | Act 586 | |
2012-04-16 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-02 | House Sent to Governor | |
2012-03-21 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-21 | Senate Third Read | |
2012-03-14 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2012-03-13 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-08 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2012-02-07 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-02-07 | House Third Readers | |
2012-02-02 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-01-12 | House Second Readers | |
2012-01-11 | House First Readers |