GA HB710 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on December 1 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-14 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 1 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-14 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 30 of the O.C.G.A., relating to disabled persons, so as to provide for the establishment of a qualified ABLE program in this state to enable the contribution of funds to tax-exempt accounts to pay for the qualified expenses of eligible individuals with disabilities; to amend Code Section 48-7-27 of the O.C.G.A., relating to computation of taxable net income; to amend Code Section 50-13-2 of the O.C.G.A., relating to the definitions for purposes of the Georgia Administrative Procedure Act, so as to exclude the Georgia ABLE Program Corporation from the meaning of "agency"; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Achieving a Better Life Experience (ABLE) Act; enact
Sponsors
Rep. Scot Turner [R] | Rep. Lee Hawkins [R] | Rep. Wendell Willard [R] | Rep. Sharon Cooper [R] |
Rep. Katie Dempsey [R] | Rep. Culver Kidd [I] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-14 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-01-13 | House | House First Readers |
2016-01-12 | House | House Hopper |
2015-12-01 | House | House Prefiled |