GA HB710 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Vetoed on May 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-11 - Veto V6
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on May 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-11 - Veto V6
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating the South Georgia Regional Information Technology Authority, approved May 29, 2007 (Ga. L. 2007, p. 4336), so as to change certain provisions relating to a definition; to change certain provisions relating to composition, terms, quorum, and voting; to change certain provisions relating to powers of the authority; to change certain provisions relating to bonds of the authority; to change certain provisions relating to rules and regulations; to change certain provisions relating to effects on powers of local governments; to change certain provisions relating to immunity; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
South Georgia Regional Information Technology Authority; change certain provisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-04-03 - Senate - Senate Vote #396 - Local Consent Calendar (Y: 47 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2009-03-23 - House - House Vote #315 - Local Calendar (Y: 153 N: 1 NV: 20 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2009-03-23 - House - House Vote #315 - Local Calendar (Y: 153 N: 1 NV: 20 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Veto V6 | |
2009-05-11 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-16 | House Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-03 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2009-04-03 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-03-25 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2009-03-23 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2009-03-23 | House Third Readers | |
2009-03-23 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-03-17 | House Withdrawn, Recommitted | |
2009-03-17 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-03-12 | House Second Readers | |
2009-03-10 | House First Readers |