GA HB71 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-30 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-30 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to amend Title 33 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to insurance, so as to provide for consumer protections regarding health insurance; to provide for definitions; to provide for disclosure requirements of providers, hospitals, and insurers; to provide for network composition; to provide for billing and reimbursement of in-network and out-of-network services; to provide for payment of emergency services; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Insurance; consumer protections regarding health insurance; provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Richard Smith [R] | Rep. Jay Powell [R] | Rep. Johnnie Caldwell [R] | Rep. Terry England [R] |
Rep. Mandi Ballinger [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-03 - House - House Vote #179 (Y: 160 N: 12 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-30 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2017-03-03 | House | House Tabled |
2017-03-03 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-03-01 | House | House Postponed |
2017-02-28 | House | House Postponed |
2017-02-17 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-01-25 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-01-24 | House | House First Readers |
2017-01-23 | House | House Hopper |