GA HB708 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Effective Date 2023-05-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Effective Date 2023-05-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to authorize the governing authority of the City of Ellijay to levy an excise tax pursuant to subsection (b) of Code Section 48-13-51 of the O.C.G.A.; to provide procedures, conditions, and limitations; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Ellijay, City of; levy an excise tax
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-23 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #272 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #242 (Y: 157 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #242 (Y: 157 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | Effective Date 2023-05-01 | |
2023-05-01 | Act 190 | |
2023-05-01 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2023-03-30 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2023-03-16 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2023-03-16 | House | House Third Readers |
2023-03-16 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2023-03-13 | House | House Second Readers |
2023-03-09 | House | House First Readers |
2023-03-08 | House | House Hopper |