GA HB706 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to elementary and secondary education, so as to delete obsolete, unused, and unnecessary provisions; to clarify a provision relating to eligibility for enrollment; to eliminate a deadline for annual performance evaluations; to clarify the legal status of regional educational service agencies; to provide that declarations of intent and attendance records for home study programs are submitted to the Department of Education rather than local school systems; to revise provisions for purposes of conformity; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Elementary and secondary education; delete and clarify provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Amy Carter [R] | Rep. Brooks Coleman [R] | Rep. Tom Dickson [R] | Rep. Mike Dudgeon [R] |
Rep. Terry England [R] | Rep. Margaret Kaiser [D] | Sen. Lindsey Tippins [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-29 - House - House Vote #814 - Agree Sen Sub (Y: 168 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #630 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 39 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - House - House Vote #450 - Passage (Y: 162 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #630 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 39 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - House - House Vote #450 - Passage (Y: 162 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2012-04-19 | Act 619 | |
2012-04-19 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-05 | House Sent to Governor | |
2012-03-29 | House Agree Senate Amend or Sub | |
2012-03-14 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-14 | Senate Third Read | |
2012-02-21 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2012-02-17 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-02 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2012-02-01 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-02-01 | House Third Readers | |
2012-01-30 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-01-25 | House Withdrawn, Recommitted | |
2012-01-12 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-01-12 | House Second Readers | |
2012-01-11 | House First Readers |