GA HB700 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Effective Date 2023-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act establishing the membership of the Board of Education of Dooly County, approved April 6, 1967 (Ga. L. 1967, p. 2922), as amended, so as to change the description of the education districts; to provide for definitions and inclusions; to provide for continuation in office of current members for the remainder of the terms to which they were elected; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dooly County; Board of Education; change description of districts

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-29 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #338 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #235 (Y: 171 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-03 Effective Date 2023-07-01
2023-05-03 Act 293
2023-05-03HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2023-04-05HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2023-03-29SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2023-03-27SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2023-03-16SenateSenate Read and Referred
2023-03-15HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2023-03-15HouseHouse Third Readers
2023-03-15HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2023-03-09HouseHouse Second Readers
2023-03-08HouseHouse First Readers
2023-03-07HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback