GA HB700 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-11 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-11 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 20 of the O.C.G.A., relating to education, so as to provide for utilization by the Board of Regents of certain construction related services of the Georgia State Financing and Investment Commission; to provide for utilization by the Georgia Education Authority (University) of certain construction related services of the Georgia State Financing and Investment Commission; to provide for utilization by the Georgia Higher Education Facilities Authority of certain construction related services of the Georgia State Financing and Investment Commission; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Education Authority; Georgia State Financing and Investment Commission construction services; provide utilization
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-03-12 - House - House Vote #285 - Pass (Y: 97 N: 69 NV: 6 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-11 | Senate Recommitted | |
2009-03-30 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2009-03-30 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-03-17 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2009-03-12 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2009-03-12 | House Third Readers | |
2009-03-10 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-03-09 | House Second Readers | |
2009-03-05 | House First Readers |