GA HB699 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on April 1 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-29 - House Lost Reconsidered Bill/Res
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 1 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-29 - House Lost Reconsidered Bill/Res
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 80 of Title 36 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions relative to provisions applicable to counties, municipal corporations, and other governmental entities, so as to define a certain term; to provide that when a majority of an elected governing body is not elected to serve the next term of office, such body shall not have the authority to incur debt, execute contracts, or dispose of assets; to provide that such contracts or instruments of indebtedness shall be void ab initio; to provide for a cause of action to enforce such provisions; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Local government; define a certain term; provisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-29 - House - House Vote #707 (Y: 80 N: 78 NV: 14 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2016-02-29 - House - House Vote #708 (Y: 104 N: 62 NV: 6 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - House Vote #709 (Y: 82 N: 81 NV: 9 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2016-02-29 - House - House Vote #708 (Y: 104 N: 62 NV: 6 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - House Vote #709 (Y: 82 N: 81 NV: 9 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-29 | House | House Lost Reconsidered Bill/Res |
2016-02-29 | House | House Reconsidered |
2016-02-29 | House | House Third Reading Lost |
2016-02-29 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-02-29 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2016-02-25 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2016-01-11 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-04-02 | House | House First Readers |
2015-04-01 | House | House Hopper |