GA HB696 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 48-8-3 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to exemptions from state sales and use taxes, so as to create an exemption for certain computer equipment sold or leased to certain entities for use in high-technology data centers; to provide for definitions; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Sales and use tax; certain computer equipment sold or leased to certain entities for use in high-technology data centers; create exemption
Sponsors
Rep. Trey Kelley [R] | Rep. Christian Coomer [R] | Sen. Sam Watson [R] | Rep. James Shaw [R] |
Rep. Ron Stephens [R] | Rep. Roger Bruce [D] | Sen. Steve Gooch [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - House - House Vote #824 (Y: 108 N: 54 NV: 14 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-23 - Senate - Senate Vote #664 (Y: 37 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-23 - Senate - Senate Vote #683 (Y: 42 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Vote #610 (Y: 82 N: 85 NV: 8 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2018-02-28 - House - House Vote #611 (Y: 134 N: 31 NV: 10 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Vote #622 (Y: 120 N: 48 NV: 7 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-23 - Senate - Senate Vote #664 (Y: 37 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-23 - Senate - Senate Vote #683 (Y: 42 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Vote #610 (Y: 82 N: 85 NV: 8 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2018-02-28 - House - House Vote #611 (Y: 134 N: 31 NV: 10 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Vote #622 (Y: 120 N: 48 NV: 7 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | Effective Date | |
2018-05-07 | Act 421 | |
2018-05-07 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2018-04-05 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2018-03-29 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-02-28 | House | House Passed/Adopted Reconsidered Bill/Resolution By Substitute |
2018-02-28 | House | House Reconsidered |
2018-02-28 | House | House Third Reading Lost |
2018-02-28 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-02-22 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-01-22 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-01-19 | House | House First Readers |
2018-01-18 | House | House Hopper |