GA HB692 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-16 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-16 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to elementary and secondary education, so as to provide for the automatic decrease in the salary of a teacher or other certificated professional personnel for any salary increase or bonus provided based, in whole or in part, on the results of standardized test scores which were falsified or known or caused to be falsified by such teacher or professional; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Educational professionals; reduce salary if test scores were falsified; provide
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #691 - Passage (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - House Vote #562 - Passage (Y: 140 N: 2 NV: 29 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - House Vote #562 - Passage (Y: 140 N: 2 NV: 29 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-16 | Effective Date | |
2012-04-16 | Act 589 | |
2012-04-16 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-03 | House Sent to Governor | |
2012-03-26 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-26 | Senate Third Read | |
2012-03-14 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2012-03-13 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-29 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2012-02-28 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-02-28 | House Third Readers | |
2012-02-24 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-01-11 | House Second Readers | |
2012-01-10 | House First Readers |