GA HB690 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 5 of Article 8 of Chapter 2 of Title 47 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to membership of certain law enforcement officers in the Employees' Retirement System of Georgia, so as to provide that certain law enforcement officers may obtain creditable service in such retirement system under certain conditions; to define a certain term; to provide for the payment of the full actuarial value of obtaining such creditable service; to provide for application; to provide for related matters; to provide conditions for an effective date and automatic repeal; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Employees' Retirement System of Georgia; provide that certain law enforcement officers obtain creditable service in system under certain conditions; provisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #721 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #682 (Y: 40 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - House - House Vote #487 (Y: 162 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-07-01 Effective Date
2016-04-26 Act 432
2016-04-26HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2016-04-04HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2016-03-24SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2016-03-24SenateSenate Third Read
2016-03-24SenateSenate Taken from Table
2016-03-22SenateSenate Tabled
2016-02-25SenateSenate Read Second Time
2016-02-24SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2016-02-04SenateSenate Read and Referred
2016-02-03HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2016-02-03HouseHouse Third Readers
2016-01-28HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2015-04-02HouseHouse Second Readers
2015-03-31HouseHouse First Readers
2015-03-27HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback