GA HB685 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-11 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-11 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to create the Manchester Public Utilities Authority and to provide for the appointment of members of the authority; to confer powers upon the authority; to authorize the issuance of revenue bonds of the authority payable from the revenues, tolls, fees, charges and earnings of the authority, contract payments to the authority and from other moneys pledged therefor and to authorize the collection and pledging of the revenues, tolls, fees, charges, earnings and contract payments of the authority for the payment of such revenue bonds; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Manchester Public Utilities Authority Act; enact
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-03-19 - Senate - Senate Vote #227 - Local Consent Calendar (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2009-03-12 - House - House Vote #205 - Local Calendar (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 26 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2009-03-12 - House - House Vote #205 - Local Calendar (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 26 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Effective Date | |
2009-05-11 | Act 290 | |
2009-05-11 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-14 | House Sent to Governor | |
2009-03-19 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2009-03-19 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-03-12 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2009-03-12 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2009-03-12 | House Third Readers | |
2009-03-12 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-03-09 | House Second Readers | |
2009-03-05 | House First Readers |