GA HB682 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to re-create and establish the Board of Commissioners of Long County, approved March 10, 1988 (Ga. L. 1988, p. 3755), as amended, so as to provide for staggering of terms of office for commissioner districts; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Long County; Board of Commissioners; provide staggering of terms of office
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Jones [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate Vote #422 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House Vote #441 (Y: 160 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House Vote #441 (Y: 160 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | Effective Date | |
2018-05-03 | Act 326 | |
2018-05-03 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2018-04-02 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-01-23 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2018-01-23 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-01-23 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-01-19 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-01-18 | House | House First Readers |
2018-01-11 | House | House Hopper |