GA HB676 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-23 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 14 of Title 44 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to mortgages, conveyances to secure debt, and liens, in general, so as to provide protections for military service members in the event of foreclosures or other proceedings to enforce secured obligations; to define a term; to provide for applicability; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Property; protections for military service members in the event of foreclosures to enforce secured obligations; provide

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-23HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-01-19HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-01-18HouseHouse First Readers
2018-01-11HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback