GA HB665 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-09 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-09 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 3 of Chapter 7 of Title 52 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to abandoned vessels, so as to revise notice requirements regarding abandoned vessels; to eliminate duplication of notices to the Department of Natural Resources and the Georgia Bureau of Investigation; to provide that such notice shall only be made to the Department of Natural Resources; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Abandoned vessels; revise notice requirements; provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Eddie Lumsden [R] | Rep. Alan Powell [R] | Rep. Bill Hitchens [R] | Rep. Andrew Welch [R] |
Rep. Robert Trammell [D] | Sen. Matt Brass [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-13 - House - House Vote #489 (Y: 162 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-09 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-02-13 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2018-02-13 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-02-08 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-01-11 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-01-10 | House | House First Readers |
2018-01-09 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/51983 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20172018/170966 |
Roll Call | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/51983#15634 |