GA HB665 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 2 of Title 21 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to primaries and elections generally, so as to provide for a pilot program for the 2010 general primary and general election for the electronic transmission of absentee ballots by military and overseas citizens; to provide for the requirements and procedures for such program; to provide for certain rules and regulations; to provide for certain reports; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Elections; 2010 pilot program; electronic transmission of absentee ballots; provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Hinton Amerson [R] | Sen. Don Balfour [R] | Rep. Doug Collins [R] | Rep. Mark Hamilton [R] |
Rep. Bob Hanner [D] | Rep. Austin Scott [R] | Rep. John Yates [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #698 - Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2010-02-17 - House - House Vote #581 - Pass (Y: 165 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2010-02-17 - House - House Vote #581 - Pass (Y: 165 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2010-06-02 | Act 557 | |
2010-06-02 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2010-05-03 | House Sent to Governor | |
2010-04-12 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2010-04-12 | Senate Third Read | |
2010-04-01 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2010-03-31 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-02-18 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2010-02-17 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2010-02-17 | House Third Readers | |
2010-02-04 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-02-03 | House Withdrawn, Recommitted | |
2010-01-28 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-03-09 | House Second Readers | |
2009-03-05 | House First Readers |