GA HB664 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-10 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-10 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to provide for a new charter for the City of Avalon; to repeal specific laws; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Avalon, City of; provide new charter
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-01-31 - Senate - Senate Vote #425 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - House - House Vote #456 (Y: 163 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - House - House Vote #456 (Y: 163 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-10 | Effective Date | |
2014-04-10 | Act 360 | |
2014-04-10 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2014-03-24 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2014-01-31 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2014-01-31 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2014-01-22 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2014-01-22 | House | House Third Readers |
2014-01-22 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2013-03-28 | House | House Second Readers |
2013-03-26 | House | House First Readers |
2013-03-25 | House | House Hopper |