GA HB65 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-14 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-14 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 19-8-23 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to where records of adoption are kept, examination of adoption records by parties and attorneys, and use of information by agency and department, so as to clarify that nonidentifying medical information contained in adoption records shall be open to certain persons for purposes of providing medical treatment and diagnoses; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Adoption records; medical information open to certain persons; clarify
Sponsors
Rep. Tom McCall [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-14 | House Withdrawn, Recommitted | |
2011-03-11 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-01-26 | House Second Readers | |
2011-01-25 | House First Readers |