GA HB646 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-02-22 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 2 of Title 31 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the Department of Community Health, so as to reinstate a pilot program to provide coverage for bariatric surgical procedures for the treatment and management of obesity and related conditions; to provide for automatic repeal; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Community Health, Department of; pilot program to provide coverage for bariatric surgical procedures; reinstate

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-21 - House - House Vote #533 (Y: 142 N: 22 NV: 9 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-22SenateSenate Read and Referred
2018-02-21HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-02-21HouseHouse Third Readers
2018-02-07HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-01-08HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-03-30HouseHouse First Readers
2017-03-30HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback