GA HB646 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate State and Local Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate State and Local Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act providing for a supplement to the salaries of the judges of the superior court of the Clayton Judicial Circuit, approved April 10, 1969 (Ga. L. 1969, p. 353), as amended, particularly by an Act approved May 5, 2006 (Ga. L. 2006, p. 4683), so as to increase the county supplement to the state salary of said judges; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Clayton Judicial Circuit; judges of superior court; increase county supplement to state salary
Sponsors
Rep. Sandra Scott [D] | Rep. Valencia Stovall [D] | Rep. Ronnie Mabra [D] | Rep. Darryl Jordan [D] |
Rep. Mike Glanton [D] | Rep. Demetrius Douglas [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-27 - House - House Vote #319 (Y: 158 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-27 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-03-27 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2015-03-27 | House | House Third Readers |
2015-03-27 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-03-25 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-03-24 | House | House First Readers |
2015-03-23 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/44873 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20152016/151921 |
Roll Call | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/44873#12714 |