GA HB645 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Effective Date 2023-05-03
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Effective Date 2023-05-03
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to provide a new charter for the City of Sylvester, approved May 13, 2008 (Ga. L. 2008, p. 4219), as amended, so as to authorize the municipal court to levy and collect a technology fee; to provide for authorized uses of the proceeds of such fee; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Sylvester, City of; municipal court; levy and collect a technology fee
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Yearta [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-16 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #239 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #219 (Y: 157 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #219 (Y: 157 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-03 | Effective Date 2023-05-03 | |
2023-05-03 | Act 286 | |
2023-05-03 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2023-03-30 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2023-03-09 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2023-03-09 | House | House Third Readers |
2023-03-09 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2023-03-06 | House | House Second Readers |
2023-03-02 | House | House First Readers |
2023-03-01 | House | House Hopper |