GA HB642 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 12 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - House Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to provide a new charter for the City of Zebulon, Georgia; to provide for incorporation, boundaries, and powers of the city; to provide for general powers and limitations on powers; to provide for organization, regular, and special meetings of the city council; to provide for rules of procedure, quorums and voting regarding city council meetings; to provide for branches of government; to provide for a governing authority of such city and the powers, duties, authority, election, terms, removal from office, method of filling vacancies, compensation, expenses, qualifications, and conflicts of interest; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Zebulon, City of; provide new charter

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #374 (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Vote #294 (Y: 156 N: 1 NV: 13 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-12HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2019-04-02SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2019-03-29SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2019-03-28SenateSenate Read and Referred
2019-03-26HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2019-03-26HouseHouse Third Readers
2019-03-26HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2019-03-25HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-03-22HouseHouse First Readers
2019-03-21HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback