GA HB642 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-07 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-07 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to incorporate the City of Brookhaven in DeKalb County, approved April 16, 2012 (Ga. L. 2012, p. 5527), so as to clarify provisions regarding the terms of office of the mayor; to provide for a finance director; to provide for the duties of such finance director; to provide for a charter commission; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Brookhaven, City of; clarify provisions regarding terms of office of mayor
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #278 (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-22 - House - House Vote #332 (Y: 161 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-03-22 - House - House Vote #332 (Y: 161 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-07 | Effective Date | |
2013-05-07 | Act 308 | |
2013-05-07 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2013-04-04 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2013-03-28 | House | House Agrees Senate Amend or Sub |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2013-03-22 | House | House Immediately Transmitted to Senate |
2013-03-22 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2013-03-22 | House | House Third Readers |
2013-03-22 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2013-03-21 | House | House Second Readers |
2013-03-20 | House | House First Readers |
2013-03-20 | House | House Hopper |