GA HB641 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-22 - Senate Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-22 - Senate Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 15 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to courts, so as to substantially revise, supersede, and modernize provisions relating to juvenile proceedings; to provide for the Office of the Child Advocate for the Protection of Children; to amend Article 1 of Chapter 5 of Title 49 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to children and youth services so as to provide for an appeal procedure when the Division of Family and Children Services of the Department of Human Services fails to provide aftercare and transitional services to certain children; to provide for the Department of Human Services to provide for performance measures for an independent living skills program; to amend the Official Code of Georgia Annotated so as to conform provisions to the new Chapter 11 of Title 15 and correct cross-references; and for other purposes.
Title
Courts; juvenile proceedings; substantially revise provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Stacey Abrams [D] | Rep. Doug Collins [R] | Sen. Bill Hamrick [R] | Rep. Edward Lindsey [R] |
Rep. Judith Manning [R] | Rep. Mary Oliver [D] | Rep. Wendell Willard [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-29 - House - House Vote #577 - Passage (Y: 172 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-22 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-03-05 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2012-02-29 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-02-29 | House Third Readers | |
2012-02-24 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-04-14 | House Second Readers | |
2011-04-12 | House First Readers |