GA HB640 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 11 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - House Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating the State Court of Ware County, formerly the City Court of Waycross, approved December 11, 1897 (Ga. L. 1897, p. 510), as amended, particularly by an Act approved July 30, 1903 (Ga. L. 1903, p. 171), so as to provide that the clerk of the superior court of Ware County shall also be the clerk of the state court of Ware County; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ware County; superior court clerk shall also be state court clerk; provide

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #304 (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Vote #275 (Y: 156 N: 2 NV: 15 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-11HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2019-03-28SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2019-03-28SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2019-03-26SenateSenate Read and Referred
2019-03-25HouseHouse Immediately Transmitted to Senate
2019-03-25HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2019-03-25HouseHouse Third Readers
2019-03-25HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2019-03-22HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-03-21HouseHouse First Readers
2019-03-18HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback