GA HB64 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-01 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-01 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 13-1-11 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the validity and enforcement of obligations to pay attorney's fees upon notes or other evidence of indebtedness, so as to change provisions relating to the payment of attorney fees where such fees are provided for but a specific amount of fees are not set forth in the instrument; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Attorney fees; validity and enforcement; change provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Jacobs [R] | Rep. Roger Lane [R] | Rep. Edward Lindsey [R] | Rep. Douglas McKillip [D] |
Rep. Matthew Ramsey [R] | Rep. Andrew Welch [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-02-28 - House - House Vote #70 - Passage (Y: 154 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-01 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2011-02-28 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2011-02-28 | House Third Readers | |
2011-02-17 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-01-26 | House Second Readers | |
2011-01-25 | House First Readers |