GA HB637 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to provide a new charter for the City of Hazlehurst; to provide for severability; to provide for other matters relative to the foregoing; to provide a specific repealer; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Hazlehurst, City of; provide a new charter
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #215 (Y: 46 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - House - House Vote #287 (Y: 113 N: 42 NV: 12 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - House - House Vote #287 (Y: 113 N: 42 NV: 12 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2015-05-12 | Act 277 | |
2015-05-12 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2015-04-06 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-03-24 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2015-03-24 | House | House Third Readers |
2015-03-24 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-03-23 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-03-20 | House | House First Readers |
2015-03-19 | House | House Hopper |