GA HB635 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 11 of Title 47 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the Judges of the Probate Courts Retirement Fund, so as to increase the number of years of mandatory contribution to such fund; to increase the maximum number of years used to calculate benefits; to provide for certain creditable service; to provide for application and payment of funds; to provide conditions for an effective date and automatic repeal; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Judges of Probate Courts Retirement Fund; increase number of years of mandatory contribution; provisions
Sponsors
Rep. James Epps [R] | Sen. Ellis Black [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #595 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House Vote #513 (Y: 128 N: 28 NV: 9 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House Vote #513 (Y: 128 N: 28 NV: 9 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2016-04-26 | Act 427 | |
2016-04-26 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2016-03-28 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-02-10 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2016-02-10 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-02-04 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-03-20 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-03-19 | House | House First Readers |
2015-03-19 | House | House Hopper |