GA HB635 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act entitled "Macon Water Commissioners - Pension Plan," approved December 30, 1953 (Ga. L. 1953, p. 2831), as amended, particularly by an Act approved March 24, 1994 (Ga. L. 1994, p. 3947), an Act approved April 4, 1996 (Ga. L. 1996, p. 4042), an Act approved May 17, 2004 (Ga. L. 2004, p. 4384), and an Act approved May 5, 2006 (Ga. L. 2006, p. 4392), so as to change the normal retirement age for certain employees; to change the definition of the term "disability"; to provide the actuarial equivalent basis which is stated in the document; to provide for certain limitations on compensation and benefits; to provide for related matters; to provide conditions for an effective date and automatic repeal; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Macon Water Commissioners - Pension Plan; change provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Dickey [R] | Rep. James Epps [R] | Rep. Susan Holmes [R] | Sen. David Lucas [D] |
Rep. Allen Peake [R] | Rep. Nikki Randall [D] | Sen. Cecil Staton [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #688 - Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - House - House Vote #506 - Passage (Y: 163 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - House - House Vote #506 - Passage (Y: 163 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2012-05-01 | Act 661 | |
2012-05-01 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-10 | House Sent to Governor | |
2012-03-26 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-26 | Senate Third Read | |
2012-03-21 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2012-03-21 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-22 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2012-02-21 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-02-21 | House Third Readers | |
2012-01-25 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-04-12 | House Second Readers | |
2011-04-11 | House First Readers |