GA HB631 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-12 - Act 211
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-12 - Act 211
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act providing a new charter for the City of Byron, approved February 13, 1941 (Ga. L. 1941, p. 1210), as amended, so as to change the corporate limits of the City of Byron; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Byron, City of; corporate city limits; change
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #338 - Local Consent Calendar (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - House - House Vote #269 - Local Calendar Without Hb 624, Hb 626, Hb 627, Sb 129 (Y: 155 N: 0 NV: 19 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - House - House Vote #269 - Local Calendar Without Hb 624, Hb 626, Hb 627, Sb 129 (Y: 155 N: 0 NV: 19 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-12 | Act 211 | |
2011-05-12 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2011-04-21 | House Sent to Governor | |
2011-04-14 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2011-04-14 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-04-12 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2011-04-11 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2011-04-11 | House Third Readers | |
2011-04-11 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-03-31 | House Second Readers | |
2011-03-30 | House First Readers |