GA HB628 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-10 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate State and Local Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-10 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate State and Local Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating the Brunswick-Glynn County Joint Water and Sewer Commission, approved April 19, 2006 (Ga. L. 2006, p. 3661), so as to provide for immunity for the commission and its officers, agents, and employees; to provide for ante litem notice; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Brunswick-Glynn County; Joint Water and Sewer Commission; create
Sponsors
Rep. Cecily Hill [R] | Rep. Jerry Keen [R] | Rep. Roger Lane [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-03-09 - House - House Vote #153 - Local Calendar (Y: 133 N: 1 NV: 32 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-10 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2009-03-09 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2009-03-09 | House Third Readers | |
2009-03-09 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-03-05 | House Second Readers | |
2009-03-04 | House First Readers |