GA HB618 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-07 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-07 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to incorporate the City of Skidaway Island; to provide for a charter for the City of Skidaway Island; to provide for incorporation, boundaries, and powers of the city; to provide for a governing authority of such city and the powers, duties, authority, election, terms, method of filling vacancies, compensation, qualifications, prohibitions, and removal from office relative to members of such governing authority; to provide for related matters; to provide for a referendum; to provide for contingent effective dates; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Skidaway Island, City of; incorporate
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-21 - House - House Vote #736 (Y: 162 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #457 (Y: 42 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House Vote #478 (Y: 158 N: 3 NV: 12 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #457 (Y: 42 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House Vote #478 (Y: 158 N: 3 NV: 12 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-07 | Effective Date | |
2018-05-07 | Act 427 | |
2018-05-07 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2018-04-02 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2018-03-21 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted As Amended |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-02-08 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-02-08 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-02-01 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-03-24 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2017-03-24 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-03-22 | House | House First Readers |
2017-03-20 | House | House Hopper |