GA HB615 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Effective Date 2023-05-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Effective Date 2023-05-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act continuing the State Court of Coweta County, approved May 17, 2004 (Ga. L. 2004, p. 4260), as amended, so as to add a judge to the court; to provide for an effective date; to provide for other matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Coweta County; State Court; add additional judge
Sponsors
Rep. Lynn Smith [R] | Rep. Josh Bonner [R] | Rep. David Jenkins [R] | Rep. Mandisha Thomas [D] |
Rep. Lydia Glaize [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-21 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #253 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #235 (Y: 171 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #235 (Y: 171 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | Effective Date 2023-05-01 | |
2023-05-01 | Act 157 | |
2023-05-01 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2023-03-30 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2023-03-15 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2023-03-15 | House | House Third Readers |
2023-03-15 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2023-03-01 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2023-03-01 | House | House Second Readers |
2023-02-28 | House | House First Readers |
2023-02-27 | House | House Hopper |