GA HB615 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to create the Board of Commissioners of Walker County; to provide for continuation of certain obligations and liabilities; to provide for the composition of the board; to provide for the specific repeal of a certain local Act; to provide for a referendum; to provide for related matters; to provide for effective dates and automatic repeal; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Walker County; Board of Commissioners; create
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Vote #299 (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - House - House Vote #312 (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - House - House Vote #312 (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 21) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | Effective Date | |
2017-05-04 | Act 165 | |
2017-05-04 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2017-04-07 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-03-24 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2017-03-24 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-03-24 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-03-22 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-03-20 | House | House First Readers |
2017-03-20 | House | House Hopper |