GA HB615 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to provide a homestead exemption from Polk County ad valorem taxes for county purposes in the amount of $30,000.00 of the assessed value of the homestead for certain residents of the county who are 70 years of age or older with net annual household income of $10,000.00 or less; to provide for definitions; to specify the terms and conditions of the exemption and the procedures relating thereto; to provide for applicability; to provide for a referendum, effective dates, and automatic repeal; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Polk County; ad valorem tax for county purposes; provide exemption
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #806 - Local Consent Calendar (Y: 53 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - House - House Vote #251 - Local Calendar (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 28 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - House - House Vote #251 - Local Calendar (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 28 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | Effective Date | |
2012-04-11 | Act 495 | |
2012-04-11 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-03 | House Sent to Governor | |
2012-03-29 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-29 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-04-11 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2011-03-31 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2011-03-31 | House Third Readers | |
2011-03-31 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-03-30 | House Second Readers | |
2011-03-29 | House First Readers |