GA HB611 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Veto V8
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Veto V8
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 1 of Article 4 of Chapter 12 of Title 45 of the O.C.G.A., relating to management of budgetary and financial affairs, so as to provide for the disposition of state funds derived from certain legal judgments or settlements; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Budgetary and financial affairs; disposition of state funds derived from certain legal judgments or settlements; provide
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-29 - House - Agree To Senate Substitute: House Vote #362 (Y: 171 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #314 (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - House - Passage: House Vote #180 (Y: 172 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #314 (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - House - Passage: House Vote #180 (Y: 172 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-05 | Veto V8 | |
2023-05-05 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2023-04-05 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2023-03-29 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Senate Recommitted |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2023-03-06 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2023-03-06 | House | House Third Readers |
2023-03-02 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2023-02-28 | House | House Second Readers |
2023-02-27 | House | House First Readers |
2023-02-27 | House | House Hopper |