GA HB61 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 48-8-30 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to imposition of tax, rates, and collection, so as to require certain retailers to either collect and remit sales and use taxes or provide certain notifications to each purchaser and the state; to define a term; to provide for penalties; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Sales and use tax; certain retailers to either collect and remit or notify purchaser and state; require
Sponsors
Rep. Jay Powell [R] | Rep. Terry England [R] | Rep. John Meadows [R] | Rep. Stacey Abrams [D] |
Rep. Trey Kelley [R] | Sen. Chuck Hufstetler [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - House - House Vote #834 (Y: 138 N: 29 NV: 11 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #694 (Y: 33 N: 18 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #735 (Y: 48 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House Vote #55 (Y: 157 N: 11 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #694 (Y: 33 N: 18 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #735 (Y: 48 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House Vote #55 (Y: 157 N: 11 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | Effective Date | |
2018-05-03 | Act 365 | |
2018-05-03 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2018-04-05 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2018-03-29 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-02-15 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2017-02-15 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-02-09 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-01-24 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-01-23 | House | House First Readers |
2017-01-12 | House | House Hopper |