GA HB607 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating the State Court of Chatham County, approved December 18, 1819 (Ga. L. 1819, p. 16), as amended, particularly by an Act approved May 12, 2015 (Ga. L. 2015, p. 4194), so as to provide for an accountability court supplement for judges of the State Court of Chatham County; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Chatham County; State Court judges; provide for an accountability court supplement
Sponsors
Rep. Ron Stephens [R] | Rep. Bill Hitchens [R] | Rep. Carl Gilliard [D] | Rep. Craig Gordon [D] |
Rep. Jesse Petrea [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #274 (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - House Vote #255 (Y: 160 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - House Vote #255 (Y: 160 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2019-04-02 | Act 21 | |
2019-04-02 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2019-03-29 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-03-21 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-21 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-21 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-18 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-03-14 | House | House First Readers |
2019-03-13 | House | House Hopper |